HI HB532 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB532
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Chief Data Officer and Data Task Force in the Office of Enterprise Technology Services to develop, implement, and manage statewide data set policies, procedures, and standards. Appropriates moneys. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Government Data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: J.Keohokalole Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 673) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1766) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1515) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:47PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 55). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 362) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB532 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 224.