HI HB530 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources (DLNR) and department of agriculture (HDOA) to meet and identify the non-agricultural park lands that should be rezoned as conservation district. Requires that agriculture lands under the jurisdiction of DLNR be transferred to HDOA not later than 12/31/2023. Requires DLNR and HDOA to meet every 5 years to discuss transferring remaining lands. Requires HDOA to inquire about any easements needed by DLNR before offering a lease.
Title
Relating To The Transfer Of Non-agricultural Park Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB530 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=530&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB530_.HTM |