HI HB530 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes linked investments to provide loan funds for agriculture and authorizes the State to invest in linked investments. Appropriates funds to the Department of Budget and Finance to hire one position to administer the linked investment program. Takes effect 7/1/2150. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Management Of State Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 750) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1912) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1235) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 53). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 844), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Okimoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19 10:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 11:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB530 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
Subjects
Agricultural Loans
Appropriation
Department of Budget and Finance
Financial Institutions
Linked Investment Program
Appropriation
Department of Budget and Finance
Financial Institutions
Linked Investment Program