HI HB470 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of benefit year and week. Conforms the manner of filing claims for partial benefits to the same as for total or part-total benefits. Allows the director of labor and industrial relations to omit benefits charged for experience rating for employers due to the event of COVID-19 in calendar years 2021 and 2022. For calendar years 2021, 2022, and 2023, sets the employer contribution rate at schedule C, D, and E, respectively. Makes amendments to contribution rate schedule and procedure for determination retroactive to 1/1/2021.
Title
Relating To Employment Security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT/PDP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB682 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB470 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT/PDP, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB470 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT/PDP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=470&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB470_.HTM |