HI SB682 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB682

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definitions of benefit year and week. Conforms the manner of filing claims for partial benefits to the same as for total or part-total benefits. Allows the director of labor and industrial relations to omit benefits charged for experience rating for employers due to the event of COVID-19 in calendar years 2021 and 2022. For calendar years 2021, 2022, and 2023, sets the employer contribution rate at schedule C, D, and E, respectively. Makes amendments to contribution rate schedule and procedure for determination retroactive to 1/1/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employment Security.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee on LCA deferred the measure.
2021-02-01SenateRe-Referred to LCA, WAM.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB470 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB682 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback