HI HB411 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 027, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 027, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new part in chapter 321, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to ensure that female sexual assault victims are provided with medically and factually accurate and unbiased information about and access to emergency contraception when receiving emergency medical care at Hawaii's hospitals. (HB411 HD2)
Title
Hospital Emergency Compassionate Care; Emergency Contraception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Act 027, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). |
2013-04-23 | House | Act 027, on 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 456). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 908) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 214). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Awana, Cabanilla, Cachola, Takai, Tokioka, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Johanson, McDermott, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-05 | House | Floor amendment failed following voice vote: Noes, 4 Representative(s) Belatti, Ichiyama, Ing, Kobayashi. Excused, 3 Representative(s) Cachola, Oshiro, Yamashita. |
2013-03-05 | House | Floor Amendment No. FA#7 offered by Rep. McDermott. |
2013-03-05 | House | Floor amendment failed following voice vote Noes, 1 Representative(s) Belatti. Excused, 0 none. |
2013-03-05 | House | Floor Amendment No. FA#6 offered by Rep. Fale. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Har; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, Wooley, McDermott. |
2013-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-28-13 at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Cabanilla, Cachola, Cheape, Cullen, Takai, Tokioka, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott voting no (4) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13 at 10:30AM. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB526 (Same As) 2013-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.