HI HB286 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Property and Health Association to manage and guide the operation of the Hawaii Property Insurance Association, Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund, and Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange.
Title
Hawaii Property and Health Association; Hawaii Property Insurance Association; Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund; Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-15. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-29-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=286&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB286_.HTM |