HI HB282 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the circumstances where a minor may consent to no cost emergency shelter and related services to include cases where the provider is coordinating with child welfare services. Sunsets 6/30/2023. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakashima Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Ward.
2021-04-16SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Acasio.
2021-04-15HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2021-04-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 663) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-04-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1645) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-29SenateThe committee on JDC has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-01-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-03-25SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2021-03-09SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2021-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 111).
2021-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-03HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
2021-03-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 607) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-16-21 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB22 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback