HI SB22 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB22
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the circumstances where a minor may consent to no cost emergency shelter and related services to include cases where the provider is coordinating with child welfare services. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-04-21 3:05PM in conference room 225. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB22 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HB282 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Act 023, 05/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
HB282 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Act 023, 05/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).