HI HB2740 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the DOE is authorized to enter into financing agreements or issue certificates of participation for the acquisition of public school facilities and lands for these facilities. Directs the DOE to consider entering into a financing agreement or issuance of certificates of participation for the planning, design, and construction of Royal Kunia elementary school II and appropriates funds for the necessary payments. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Public School Facilities; Royal Kunia Elementary; Certificate of Participation; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2754) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 03-10-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 581-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-10 11:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 288-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Chang, Nakashima, Rhoads, Takai, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Manahan, Saiki, Shimabukuro. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-08-10 2:05pm in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |