HI HB2698 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to convene a construction waste reuse and recycling working group to determine how to implement a requirement for the reuse, recycling, or donation of construction waste. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Construction Waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3129 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM.