HI HB2586 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Legal Aid Interagency Roundtable to facilitate cooperation between various state agencies regarding civil legal services and access to justice. Requires the roundtable to report to the Governor and Legislature. Appropriates funds to DHS for the Roundtable. (HB2586 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Legal Aid Interagency Roundtable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 405-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |