HI HB2485 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to PBS/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to PBS/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fines for violations of the fireworks control law. Authorizes the department of public safety, sheriff division, to inspect shipping containers for explosives and illegal fireworks. Requires DPS, in collaboration with DOD, DOT, and other federal and state agencies, to establish a shipping container inspection program to randomly inspect shipping containers for illegal fireworks and explosives using explosive-sniffing dogs. Requires DOT to assess a fee of $1 on all shipping containers for FY 2016-2017 and a fee of $2 thereafter to fund the program. Establishes the shipping container inspection program special fund. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Department of Public Safety; Sheriff Division; Department of Transportation; Shipping Container Inspection Program; Illegal Fireworks; Explosives; Fees; Penalties; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to PBS/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2632 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2485&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2485_.HTM |