HI HB248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes members of secular or non-religious organizations to solemnize marriages and civil unions. Requires every person or society licensed to solemnize marriages or civil unions to pay a fee for each marriage ceremony or civil union solemnization performed within the State. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Personal Relationships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 204). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB248 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.