HI HB2455 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of health to establish maximum retail prices for medical marijuana and manufactured marijuana products. Delays authority to establish medical marijuana price controls until 7/1/2017.
Title
Health; Medical Marijuana; Dispensaries; Price Controls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2455&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2455_.HTM |