HI HB2330 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends exemption from general excise tax for development costs of affordable rental housing certified by HHFDC. Removes limits on costs eligible for exemption and authorizes exemption for substantially renovated projects. Prohibits discrimination against tenants based solely on receipt of Section 8 housing assistance. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Green. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 703) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3682) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3000) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2757 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).