HI HB229 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent certain state and county protections from liability on improved lands. Makes permanent the protection from liability for county lifeguards, counties, and the State for damages resulting from rescue, resuscitative, or other lifeguard services.
Title
Kauai County Package; Tort Liability; Lifeguards; Improved Public Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=229&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB229_.HTM |