HI HB2240 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds to pay or prepay the State's other post-employment benefits liability under certain conditions. Requires that the outstanding balance of general obligation bonds issued to pay or prepay the other post-employment benefits liability to be considered in the calculation of public employers' annual required contribution to the other post-employment benefits trust fund. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Other Post-employment Benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 231-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 231-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Yamashita, Belatti, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 4-29-22 3:05PM; CR309. |
2022-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-22 10:01AM in conference room 224. |
2022-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-22 10:01AM in conference room 224. |
2022-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 10:01AM in conference room 224. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 896). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Belatti, Sayama, Okimoto. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 839) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3843) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 78). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 254-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3332 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Subjects
General Obligation Bonds (GO Bonds)
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust Fund (OPEB Trust) ($)
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust Fund (OPEB Trust) ($)