HI HB2169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act 212, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act 212, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the supervision requirements for licensure of clinical social workers, including permitting the option to fulfill all or part of the face-to-face supervision requirements through supervision via a video conference service that is compliant with all federal and state privacy, security, and confidentiality laws, including the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996. (SD1)
Title
Social Workers; Licensed Clinical Social Workers; Licensing Requirements; Supervision
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Act 212, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). |
2016-07-08 | House | Act 212, on 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). |
2016-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 677). |
2016-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-04-29 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 666). |
2016-04-28 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-16. |
2016-04-26 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, McKelvey, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2016-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, McDermott. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Ruderman. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392). |
2016-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-16. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3300) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-29-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 264). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-02-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-29 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-29-16. |
2016-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 542-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-18 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2669 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).