HI SB2669 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the supervision requirements for licensure of clinical social workers, including by permitting the option of meeting supervision requirements through a video conference service that is compliant with all federal and state privacy, security, and confidentiality laws, including the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996. (SB2669 HD1)
Title
Licensed Clinical Social Workers; Licensing Requirements; Supervision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6). |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-17-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 224) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2169 (Same As) 2016-07-07 - Act 212, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).