HI HB2065 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Hawaii Constitution to authorize the board of education to impose a surcharge on real property taxes to fund public school capital improvement projects.
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Real Property Taxes; Board of Education (ConAm)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2292 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to PSM/EDU/JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2065&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2065_.HTM |