HI HB2054 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPN, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPN, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Uniform Power of Attorney Act. Repeals Chapter 551D, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (HB2054 HD1)
Title
Uniform Power of Attorney Act; Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 296). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-20-14 1:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2229 (Same As) 2014-04-22 - Act 022, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).