HI HB2053 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes medical cannabis dispensaries to distribute cannabis propagules and cuttings to individuals authorized to cultivate cannabis plants for medical use, subject to quantity limits and quality requirements. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Cannabis For Medical Use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 343-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |