HI HB2011 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a payroll assessment to fund sick leave in the private sector.
Title
Sick Leave; Payroll Assessment ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2290 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2011&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2011_.HTM |