HI HB2007 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cash or protest bonds to be returned to the initiating parties, minus administrative costs, except in cases where the appeal was frivolous or made in bad faith. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-01-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-22 at 9:30AM. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Administrative Proceedings for Review
Cash or Protest Bond
Forfeiture
Hawaii Public Procurement Code
Return to Party
Cash or Protest Bond
Forfeiture
Hawaii Public Procurement Code
Return to Party