HI HB1984 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the deadlines related to the repair of conditions that constitute health or safety violations and the payment of past due rent. Increases the amount deducted from a tenant's rent for the tenant's actual expenditures to correct health or safety violations and defective conditions.
Title
Relating To The Residential Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Micah Aiu [D] | Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] |
Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1984&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1984_.HTM |