HI HB1981 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a fiscal impact statement for any proposed legislation that calls for an appropriation or results in significant fiscal changes for the State. Prohibits hearing on bills and resolutions without a fiscal impact statement prepared by the Office of the Legislative Analyst.
Title
Fiscal Impact Statements
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Feki Pouha [R] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2719 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1981&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1981_.HTM |