HI HB1930 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends collective bargaining law to ensure that exclusive bargaining representatives retain the resources necessary to adequately represent public employees and remove economic incentive to free ride.
Title
Relating To Public Employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-08-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2369 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1930&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1930_.HTM |