HI HB1895 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers to cover contraceptive supplies dispensed in an amount sufficient for a twelve-month period. (HB1895 HD2)
Title
Insurance; Contraceptives; Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 644-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 203-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-08-16 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-16 3:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-04 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2319 (Same As) 2016-07-06 - Act 205, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).