HI SB2319 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 205, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 205, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers in the State, including health benefits plans under the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund and Medicaid managed care programs, to cover reimbursement for contraceptive supplies intended to last for up to a twelve-month period for an insured. (CD1)
Title
Insurance; Prescription Contraceptive Supplies; Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Act 205, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). |
2016-07-07 | House | Act 205, on 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, LoPresti, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, LoPresti Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 527). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1640-16) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6). |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-03-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-11-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 45) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2548) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-16 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2327) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1895 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).