HI HB1871 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Converts the department of human resources development to a division in the department of labor and industrial relations. Transfers the commission on salaries and the deferred compensation plan board of trustees to the department of accounting and general services.
Title
Department of Human Resources Development
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-05-10 9:30 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-13 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1871&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1871_.HTM |