HI HB1838 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes, within the office of planning and sustainable development, a taskforce, advisory group, and consultant team to develop a coastal zone framework-development taskforce to develop a programmatic framework for a Hawaii next generation coastal zone management program. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To A Coastal Zone Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-10-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2814 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Advisory Group
Appropriation ($)
Coastal Erosion
Enhanced Curriculum
Hawaii Next Generation Coastal Zone Managers Program
Jobs Program
Permits
Shoreline
Taskforce
Appropriation ($)
Coastal Erosion
Enhanced Curriculum
Hawaii Next Generation Coastal Zone Managers Program
Jobs Program
Permits
Shoreline
Taskforce
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1838&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1838_.HTM |