HI HB1736 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures participation of all political parties on the Reapportionment Commission by providing that if there are no members belonging to a minority party in a house of the legislature, the presiding officer of the respective house of the legislature, after consulting with the chair of a minority party, shall be given the authority to designate persons who are members of a minority party to serve on the reapportionment commission.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Iv, Section 2, Of The Hawaii State Constitution To Address The Selection Of Members Of The Reapportionment Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2044 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1736&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1736_.HTM |