HI HB1736 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the state supplemental income (SSI) for adult residential care homes (ARCHs), expanded ARCHs, and other homes specified in section 346-53, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Establishes an SSI rate for services provided by home and community-based case management agencies. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Care Homes; Foster Homes; State Supplemental Income ($)
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] |
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1736&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1736_.HTM |