HI HB1721 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the construction of a correctional facility at the Halawa Correctional Facility site to replace the existing OCCC. Requires a study on the feasibility of State redevelopment of the land that is currently occupied by OCCC. Appropriates funds.
Title
Correctional Facilities; Redevelopment; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-04-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to PBS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1721&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1721_.HTM |