HI HB164 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB164

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Hawaii Health Authority to continue planning for the adoption of a universal, publicly-administered health-care-for-all insurance model with a single payout agency. Establishes a rate stabilization reserve fund for the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund. Transfers funds from the other post-employment benefits trust fund to the rate stabilization reserve fund. Makes appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Care Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB437 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB164 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback