HI HB1637 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to establish an opt-in program by ordinance that allows an annual payment in lieu of real property taxes on the land or improvements thereon that are actively used to produce or store renewable energy that is sold to an electric utility. Effective 7/1/2100. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3411) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 131). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, McDermott. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2722 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.