HI SB2722 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the counties from imposing a real property tax on land or land improvements used for the production or storage of renewable energy that is sold to an electric utility. Permits a county to impose an annual fee of up to $1,000 per megawatt of nameplate AC capacity generated by a renewable energy project that is actively producing and selling energy to an electric utility and sited on real property within that county.
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1637 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2722&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2722_.HTM |