HI HB1523 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1523

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that the costs of devices for certain Department of Education schools shall be covered using Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (CARES Act) funds. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Education Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
2020-08-31HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425).
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421).
2020-07-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-07-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
2020-07-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3779) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-07-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-07-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 07-02-20 10:20AM in conference room Auditorium.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 314).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2019-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

HB1523 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback