HI HB1523 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1523
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021 operating budget of the Department of Education and certain programs of the Department of Accounting and General Services. Effective 7/1/2055. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 314). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1523 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.