HI HB1499 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to provide that freedom of speech does not include the expenditure of money to influence elections. (HB1499 HD1)
Title
Freedom of Speech; Monetary Expenditures to Influence Elections (ConAm)
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 213). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Johanson, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Takayama, Ward, Yamashita, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Choy, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ito, Jordan, Kawakami, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tsuji voting no (15) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-03-04 | House | Floor amendment failed following a Voice vote: Noes, 2 (Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads). Excused, 1 (Representative(s) Morikawa). |
2014-03-04 | House | Floor Amendment No. 1 offered by Rep. Oshiro. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Jordan, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2014-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Matsumoto, Fale, Har, Ito, Johanson, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto, Hanohano, McDermott, Oshiro voting no (4) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Nakashima, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |