HI HB1436 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the judiciary to support the Honolulu zero to three court. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1436 HD1)
Title
Zero to Three Court; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 340) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |