HI HB1328 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 244, on 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1347).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 244, on 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1347).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the exemption for the procurement of food or fuel products necessary for the Kahoolawe island reserve commission. Effective June 30, 2013. (SD1)
Title
Kahoolawe Island Reserve; Exemption; Procurement
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 244, on 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1347). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 244, 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1347). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-19 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Dela Cruz, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Shimabukuro. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Hanohano, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Fale. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1329) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1039) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Baker, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Chun Oakland, Wakai. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EGH deferred the measure until 03-21-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 355). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 873) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6). |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 264), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |