HI HB1270 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1270
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends temporarily the exemptions for certain persons and certain amounts of gross income or proceeds from the general excise tax and requires the payment of both taxes at a four per cent rate. Specifies that the transient accommodations tax collected on resort time share vacation units shall be on the gross rental or gross rental proceeds. Part I effective 7/1/2022, and sunsets on 6/30/2026. Part II effective 7/1/2021.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1270 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Exemption for Certain Persons and Gross Amounts
General Excise Taxes
Resort Time Share Vacation Units
Temporary Suspension
Transient Accommodations Tax
General Excise Taxes
Resort Time Share Vacation Units
Temporary Suspension
Transient Accommodations Tax
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1270&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1270_.HTM |