HI HB1270 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1270

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Suspends temporarily the exemptions for certain persons and certain amounts of gross income or proceeds from the general excise tax and requires the payment of both taxes at a four per cent rate. Specifies that the transient accommodations tax collected on resort time share vacation units shall be on the gross rental or gross rental proceeds. Part I effective 7/1/2022, and sunsets on 6/30/2026. Part II effective 7/1/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-03HouseRe-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 5
2021-02-01HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

HB1270 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback