HI HB126 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "victim" to include insurance companies for the purposes of criminal restitution orders.
Title
Victim Restitution; Criminal Restitution Orders; Insurance Companies
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-04-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=126&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB126_.HTM |