HI HB1220 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the requirement that a time share developer (1) file copies of all encumbrances affecting title to all time share units in a time share plan as part of the registration process; and (2) include in the time share disclosure statement a list all encumbrances affecting title to all time share units in a time share plan. Requires that a time share disclosure statement include a description of the condominium documents only for those time share plans where the time share owners are actually unit owners either in fee or to the extent and for the purposes provided in a recorded unit lease. Permits the developer to make ministerial updates to the disclosure statement on an expedited basis.
Title
Relating To Time Sharing Plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to TIA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1220 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to TIA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1220&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1220_.HTM |