HI HB1201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to CPN/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to CPN/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii heath benefit exchange in compliance with federal law. (HB1201 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Health Benefit Exchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN/HTH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 285). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-14-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 190) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |