HI HB1193 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1193
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for capital improvement projects relating to the Iolani Palace, State Archives, and Bishop Museum. Effective 7/1/2065. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Capital Improvement Projects For The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from LCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 167). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 779), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 497) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1193 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.