HI HB1059 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1059

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals sections 264-19, 266-2.3, and 266-22, Hawaii Revised Statutes, for the purpose of deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. Grants voting rights to members of the board of directors of the Honolulu Authority for Rapid Transportation appointed by the president of the senate or speaker of the house of representatives. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-04-19HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:15AM in conference room CR 329.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
2021-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; Takumi, Matsumoto.
2021-04-16SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads, Inouye Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2021-04-15HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2021-04-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 748) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-04-13SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Moriwaki, Taniguchi. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1635) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki.
2021-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-21 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
2021-03-22SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC.
2021-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
2021-03-09SenateReferred to TRS, WAM/JDC.
2021-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 152).
2021-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-17HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-12HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1213 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1059 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:15AM in conference room CR 329.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback